Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Warren County. This case was filed in Warren County Superior Courts with Muller, Hon. Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management24 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time176 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled Muller (Trial Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Muller (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial Muller (Court Activity) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
January 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Muller (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
January 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Muller (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
December 31, 2018 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Muller (Court Activity) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.