Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Warren County. This case was filed in Warren County Superior Courts with Muller, Hon. Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management165 days |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2017 |
CategoryRp-Other |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time371 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Post-Settled Before Trial Muller (Court Activity) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
November 15, 2017 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Muller (Trial Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
October 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Muller (Court Activity) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
October 06, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Muller (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
May 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Muller (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
May 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Muller (Motion Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Muller (Hearing) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Muller (Motion Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
April 26, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Muller (Motion Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
|
December 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Muller (Motion Part) Judge: Muller, Hon. Robert J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.