Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAuffredou, Hon. Martin D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
March 03, 2016 | Hearing |
Post-Judgment Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 03/03/2016Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
February 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Note of Issue Restoration Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Transferred from IAS Justice Krogmann (Court Activity) Judge: Krogmann, Hon. David B. |
|
August 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided Krogmann (Court Activity) Judge: Krogmann, Hon. David B. |
|
August 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Krogmann (Motion Part) Judge: Krogmann, Hon. David B. |
|
August 13, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 08/18/2015Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.