Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Krogmann, Hon. David B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKrogmann, Hon. David B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time567 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
November 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Auffredou (Court Activity) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
August 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #003) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
July 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #003) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
July 08, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #003) Decided: 11/22/2016Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Auffredou (Motion Part) Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 14, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 01/26/2016Decided Before Justice: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Auffredou, Hon. Martin D. |
|
January 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Transferred from IAS Justice Krogmann (Court Activity) Judge: Krogmann, Hon. David B. |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Krogmann (Motion Part) Judge: Krogmann, Hon. David B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.