Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Farm Credit Services Of America, Servicer For Agdirect, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bayliss, Molly, against Gopal Farm Llc, Nikhil N. Gupta N K A Nimai Pandit, in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Kevin Bryant presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2024 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This legal document is a complaint filed by Farm Credit Services of America, Servicer for AgDirect against Gopal Farms, LLC and Nikhil N. Gupta n/k/a Nimai Pandit. The complaint alleges that the defendants are in possession of certain collateral, for...
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 30, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 30, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 29, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 14, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 22, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 29, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 30, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-D Exhibits A-D
Date: January 30, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 30, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | ||
February 29, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- GUPTA N/K/A NIMAI PANDIT |
||
February 29, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE- GOPAL FARMS, LLC |
||
February 22, 2024 | AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) | ||
February 14, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #1) | ||
January 30, 2024 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 30, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | ||
January 30, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
January 30, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.