Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Kathleen Spezio, Roger Paul Spezio Sr., filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Belluck, Joseph Warren, Dymond, Seth A, against 3M Company, Individually And As Successor To Minnesota Mining And Manufacturing Company, Aii Acquisition Corporation, Llc Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Athlone Industries, Inc. And Holland Furnace Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation As Successor By Merger To Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Alcoa Inc., Individually And As Successor In Interest To Tilo Roofing Co., American Optical Corporation, (total of 62) See All represented by Bridge, Charles Christopher, Burgasser, Jessica Jean, Cerritos, Daniel E., Connor, Maryellen, Cook, Kerryann Marie, (total of 37) See All in the jurisdiction of Ulster County, NY, . Ulster County, NY Superior Courts with Erin P Gall presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErin P Gall Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationUlster County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Aii Acquisition Corporation, Llc Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Athlone Industries, Inc. And Holland Furnace Company
Avco Corporation, A Textron Lycoming Division, Individually And As Successor To Lycoming Engines F K A Lycoming Manufacturing, Spencer Heater Company, And Spencer Heater Division Of Lycoming
Bw Ip International Co., Formerly Known As Borg Warner Industrial Products Inc., A Former Subsidiary Of And Successor To Borg Warner Corp. And Byron Jackson Pumps
Cbs Corporation, A Delaware Corporation, F K A Viacom Inc, Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation, A Pennsylvania Corporation, F K A Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Continental Motors Inc. F K A Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Continental Motors Inc. And Continental Motors Company
Ecr International, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Dunkirk, Dunkirk Boilers And Utica Boilers And Pennco, Inc.
Flowserve Us, Inc., Solely As Successor To Rockwell Manufacturing Company, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc. And Edward Vogt Valve Company
Fmc Corporation, Individually And As Successor To Northern Pump Company, Coffin And Peerless Pump Company
Honeywell International, Inc., Individually And F K A Alliedsignal, Inc., And As Successor-In-Interest To The Bendix Corp.
Howden Buffalo, Inc., Individually And As Successor-In-Interest To Fb Sturtevant, The Howden Buffalo Group And Buffalo Fan
Rockwell Automation, Inc., Individually And As Successor To Allen Bradley, Timken Heating Business And S. Co., Inc. F K A Scaife Company, As Successor In Interest To Rockwell Spring & Axle Companys Timken Silent Automatic Division
Technify Motor Individually And As Successor To Teledyne Continental Motors, Inc. F K A Continental Motors, Inc. And Continental Motors Company
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #009)
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #009)
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #19)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #22)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #27)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #20)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #21)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 15, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #12)
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #8)
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #8)
Date: October 17, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #007)
Date: October 02, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 28, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 25, 2023AFFIRMATION (Motion #009)
Date: October 20, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 21, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 28, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 22, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #006)
Date: September 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006)
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006)
Date: September 01, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 09, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #21) Plaintiff's answers to Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 25, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #20)
Date: November 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 07, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 20, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #19)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #21)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #21)
Date: November 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #21)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #21)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #20)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #20)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #20) Plaintiff's answers to Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #15) Plaintiff's Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #20)
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #19)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #14)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 27, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #18)
Date: November 15, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #19)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #23)
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #15)
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #14)
Date: November 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #17)
Date: November 15, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #18)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #11) *Corrected*
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #16)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #11)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #14)
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #10)
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #15)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #17)
Date: December 14, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #13)
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #13)
Date: November 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #11)
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #12)
Date: November 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #10)
Date: October 23, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #14)
Date: December 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 15, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #23)
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #13)
Date: December 14, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #23)
Date: December 12, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #28)
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #11)
Date: November 17, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #11)
Date: November 17, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #10)
Date: November 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #009)
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 21, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND *Corrected*
Date: July 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: July 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 17, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: July 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: June 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: May 25, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 25, 2023SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: May 25, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #004)
Date: May 24, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: May 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #27)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #26)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #26) Plaintiffs Answers to Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #26)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #26) Amended Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #26)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #26)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #8)
Date: November 17, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #25)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #24) Plaintiffs Answers to Interrogatories Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #24)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #030)
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #16)
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #16)
Date: January 05, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 03, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 04, 2024ADMISSION OF SERVICE (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #17)
Date: January 03, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #14)
Date: January 02, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 29, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #27)
Date: December 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #22)
Date: December 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #029)
Date: December 28, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #28)
Date: December 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #15)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #14)
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #15)
Date: November 14, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #12)
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #14)
Date: November 14, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #26)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #25)
Date: December 22, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #24)
Date: December 22, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #003)
Date: February 16, 2023ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 03, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 09, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 08, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 08, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #002)
Date: February 16, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 02, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #003)
Date: January 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #003)
Date: January 25, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: January 25, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 25, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 25, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 19, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #24)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #24) Amended Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #23)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #24)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIRMATION (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #23)
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #24)
Date: November 16, 2023ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #007)
Date: November 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #22)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A.
Date: January 09, 2024ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #030)
Date: January 12, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 07, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 03, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 24, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 24, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 22, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: February 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #004)
Date: March 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #030) Honeywell International Inc. / Bendix |
||
January 12, 2024 |
ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) (Motion #030) Honeywell International Inc. / Bendix |
||
January 09, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY NOE as to Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. |
||
January 09, 2024 |
ORDER - DISMISSAL (Motion #16) AS TO SID HARVEY INDUSTRIES INC |
||
January 09, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A. Filed OOD as to Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. |
||
January 05, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #16) Prop. OOD based on lack of opp to SJM as to Sid Harvey Industries, Inc. |
||
January 04, 2024 |
DEMAND FOR: Dean Pump's PID Letter request for a signed NOSJM to Plaintiffs |
||
January 03, 2024 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Dean Pump |
||
January 03, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #17) On behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. |
||
January 02, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #14) ECR International |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.