Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Keith, Richard B., White, Celeste K., filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Philip A. Champlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Case Cycle Time4992 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Petition for Approval of Agreement and Approval and Settlement of Accountings | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Petition Hearing Approval of Agreement and Settlement of Accountings Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Langhorne, Monique |
|
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Waiver of Notice and Service: Robert White | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Dave Keith | |
July 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of The Valley Rock Foundation | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL S STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT S PETITION FOR INSTRUCTIONS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.