Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
C&C Tobacco Chuck'S Gas Mart, Inc., filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Hetznecker, Aubrey Davis, against Tompkins County Board Of Health, Tompkins County Whole Health, represented by Mosher, Holly Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 01, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 01, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 01, 2023PETITION
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 02, 2023ASSIGNED RJI
Date: June 02, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 07, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 27, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: July 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Notice of Transfer Order |
||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #1) Notice of Transfer |
||
July 27, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
July 12, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1) Reply Affirmation |
||
July 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
July 07, 2023 | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | ||
June 08, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Returnable on July 14, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. by MT |
||
June 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation regarding notice and final resolution |
||
June 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Admission of Service |
||
June 02, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.