Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Kerri S, Schwaber, Scott Evan, Sheerin, John J, against Blaine Ross Burlingame, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 18, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 30, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 20, 2023MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE)
Date: November 29, 2023ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2023ASSIGNED RJI
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 27, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: November 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: November 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 18, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: July 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 18, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 20, 2023 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Judgment |
||
December 20, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry |
||
December 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation |
||
December 14, 2023 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 30, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Return Date Notification |
||
November 29, 2023 | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) | ||
November 28, 2023 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 S&C and AOS |
||
November 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Payment History |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.