Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Village Of Groton, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Poplawski, Ryan Michael, against Dale And Don, Inc., Dale Parsons, Donald Titus, Jon Loudermilk, represented by Fichera-Bartolotti, Linda Rose, Maines, Russell Edgar, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 18, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023ANSWER
Date: September 07, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: May 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
September 07, 2023 | Answer With Affirmative Defenses | ||
August 31, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
July 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 25, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 25, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
May 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Guarantee |
||
May 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I July 29, 2019 Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.