Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Casebeer, Kathy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2002 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the court investigator's report filed November 22, 2021 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is due by October 17, 2023 with a review hearing on November 28, 2023 at 10:15 a.m. The Court will sign the proposed order submitted by counsel. |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only Biennial Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Re. Cost Assessment and Right to Object | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Investigator Conservatorship Review Report | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Investigator's Information Sheet Court Investigator's Information Sheet |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation Fees Deferred Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Continuing Conservatorship
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the CI Report dated 11/20/19, the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The next review hearing will be 11/30/21 at 10:15 a.m. CI Sheet is due 10/19/21. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.