Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
James A. Potter, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jessica L. Potter, represented by Cohen, Lauren S., in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 01, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 29, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 19, 2021 | ORDER OF VACATE | ||
October 21, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
October 19, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 18, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 12, 2021 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 07, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.