Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Donald J Beyer Iii, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Murphy, Liam Gorman Brenndon, Violette, Jason, against Debra S Beyer, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark G Masler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
January 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 07, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
January 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 14, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
December 01, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
November 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
November 29, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 14, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE STIPULATION/ORDER CONTESTED MATRIMONIAL (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.