Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Adam Abelson, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kopko, Edward E, Schlather, Raymond Martin, against Judith H.S. Bernal, represented by Whritenour, Matthew E., in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management726 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Case Cycle Time1029 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 16, 2020ASSIGNED RJI
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2018RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 18, 2019NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 07, 2020SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 23, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 23, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 14, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 06, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 03, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 07, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 07, 2018SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: September 14, 2020SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 03, 2020SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: December 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MCBRIDE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. JOSEPH A. MCBRIDE |
|
October 16, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 16, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED MCBRIDE (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JOSEPH A. MCBRIDE |
|
September 23, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 21, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 14, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
September 14, 2020 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
September 03, 2020 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 03, 2020 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
August 25, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MCBRIDE (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. JOSEPH A. MCBRIDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.