Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Anthony V. Acciarito, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cobb, Charles Harrison, Irving, Arienne Jill, against Erma C. Sacchi, represented by Goris, Mark Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Joseph A. Mcbride presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph A. Mcbride Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 17, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 16, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2a)
Date: February 06, 2020ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: December 23, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 06, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 03, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 26, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2a)
Date: November 22, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 20, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #1a)
Date: November 17, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1a)
Date: November 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1a)
Date: November 15, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 15, 2019SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: November 06, 2019SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 29, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 09, 2019ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: June 05, 2019DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 17, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 17, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT CASE ADJOURNMENT LETTER |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #2a) | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION (Motion #2a) | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #2b) corrected return date |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #1b) corrected return date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.