Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Advisors Group, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Debarba, Eric Phillip, Lewis, Chianti, Nduka, Ijeoma O, against Dale Van Etten As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten, Douglas Van Etten As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten, John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises, New York State Department Of Taxation & Finance, People Of The State Of New York C O Ithica City Court, (total of 14) See All represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts Tompkins County Supreme Court with Joseph Cassidy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph Cassidy Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseTompkins County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
Dale Van Etten As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten
Douglas Van Etten As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten
John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises, And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Claim, Or May Claim, A Lien Against The Premises
Regina Banfield As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten
Tabatha Van Etten Monahan As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten
Tanya Parsons As Heir At Law And Next Of Kin Of Roger Van Etten A K A Roger D. Van Etten A K A Rodger Vanetten
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: January 11, 2018ANSWER
Date: August 29, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: June 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL returned mail - judicial assignment notice |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL returned mail Judical Assignment notice |
|
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION (UPDATED RETURN DATE) (Motion #1) | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSIGNED RJI | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) (Motion #1) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) | |
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.