Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nancy Siembor-Brown, Thomas R Brown, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kopko, Edward E, against Cayuga Medical Center At Ithaca, Ithaca Orthopaedic Group Pc, Stephanie Roach Md, represented by Fowler, Margaret Joanne, Zittel, Melissa Lee, in the jurisdiction of Tompkins County, NY, . Tompkins County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Tait Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2011 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTompkins County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 16, 2011COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: January 16, 2011OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 16, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Subpoenaed records disposal approval |
||
June 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 17, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Sealed |
||
August 18, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 16, 2011 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
January 16, 2011 | COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION | ||
January 16, 2011 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT index # application |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.