Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Lisa D Norton, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County. This case was filed in Tioga County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 29, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 29, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: April 29, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: May 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
May 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 29, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
April 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
April 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
April 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
April 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
April 29, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED NON SOL |
||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.