Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2019 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
August 06, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED FAUGHNAN (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
June 24, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FAUGHNAN (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
April 18, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FAUGHNAN (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FAUGHNAN (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
January 22, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FAUGHNAN (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
|
January 04, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FAUGHNAN (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. EUGENE D. FAUGHNAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.