Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Maurice D Miller, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc. against Maurice D Miller in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Tioga. Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a corporation formed under the laws of the State of Kansas. Maurice...
JUDGMENT
Date: January 16, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 02, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 16, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
January 11, 2024 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE | ||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
January 11, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.