Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Mullen, Richard S, against Dustin L. Cody, Jatona M. Cody, John Doe, Midland Credit Management, Inc., New York State Department Of Motor Vehicles, (total of 8) See All represented by Lesperance, Karen Folster, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Eugene D Faughnan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 05, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 15, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 20, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 16, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 31, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: June 20, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: August 01, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 16, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 16, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2023PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: August 16, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: May 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 05, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: May 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A/B
Date: May 05, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) 105144-4 CLP NOE/cert of service. azh |
||
November 08, 2023 |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) Order Cancelling Notice of Pendency and Discontinuing Action |
||
August 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) filed by TSM |
||
August 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) filed by TSM |
||
August 16, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) filed by TSM |
||
August 16, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 16, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
August 16, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 16, 2023 | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.