Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Charles Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 02, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 11, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 07, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 27, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 07, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 07, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
June 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
June 07, 2023 | Affirmation of non military | ||
June 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT 2-AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER |
||
June 07, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT 1-AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER |
||
June 07, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.