Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Renee Mele, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bergman, Benjamin Karl, against Devin Mele, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Eugene D Faughnan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEugene D Faughnan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 15, 2023 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
April 25, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
April 25, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
April 20, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
April 12, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
April 12, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 12, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
April 10, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 10, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.