Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nadezhda Zaytseva , Administratrix Of The Estate Of Irina A. Zaytseva, Deceased,, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Berry, Kevin Michael, Carlo, Joseph, against Andrew D. Tift ,, Doreen Macdonald ;, Earle R. Hill Iii ; And, Scott J. Macdonald ;, represented by Goris, Mark Daniel, Savage, Joseph William, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 31, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 28, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: December 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 31, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 28, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 24, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 02, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 28, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 31, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 29, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 29, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 22, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) Pro hac vice admission of Gabriella A. Russo, Esq. |
||
October 31, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #2) Pro hac vice admission of John E. Keefe, Jr., Esq. |
||
October 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 24, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) Updated Certificate of Good Standing |
||
October 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Updated Certificate of Good Standing |
||
October 02, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 02, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 29, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint |
||
September 29, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Kevin Berry, Esq. Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.