Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Stanislaus, filed a(n) Family case against Kathleen Marie Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Family DCSS.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 05, 1993 |
CategoryFamily |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseFamily DCSS |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2006 | Action | Imaged File | |
June 18, 1997 | Hearing | Order of Examination | |
May 28, 1996 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
November 15, 1995 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause | |
February 05, 1993 | Action | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.