Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Margo Padgett, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Schimmerling, Thomas E., against Csbw Realty Corp., in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall Accident) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 26, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 28, 2022NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 08, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 15, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2023 | ORDER - AMENDED | ||
February 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 01, 2023 |
ORDER - AMENDED (Motion #1) Inquest Scheduling |
||
December 19, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service-Notice of Entry & Order |
||
December 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry & Order |
||
December 15, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 15, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 15, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Inquest Scheduling |
||
October 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Notice of Additional Service & Affidavit of Mailing |
||
October 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.