Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Jackling, Joseph M, Verhagen, Jason P, against Fred Gage, in the jurisdiction of Tioga County, NY, . Tioga County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationTioga County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 05, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 29, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 07, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 29, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 23, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 07, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 06, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 07, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 29, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
November 29, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 23, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) POSTAL |
||
November 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.