Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
W C By Father And Legal Guardian, Yi Fan Yang, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Infant Compromise) case represented by Werlin, Jerald D., against Arthur R Leaney-Levenson, represented by Zacharias, Grant David, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with E. Jose-Decker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Infant Compromise) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
|
This complaint is a petition for an infant compromise filed by W.C., an infant, through his father and guardian, Yi Fan Yang. The incident occurred on December 6, 2022, when W.C. was crossing a crosswalk at Forestburgh Road and Carriage House Road in...
COURT NOTICE
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: December 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: December 14, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 13, 2023COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 03, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 14, 2023RJI -RE: INFANT'S COMPROMISE
Date: November 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 20, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: December 12, 2023PETITION
Date: November 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #1) Filing on Behalf of - Hon. E. Danielle Jose-Decker |
||
January 03, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 14, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. E. Danielle Jose-Decker |
||
December 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
December 14, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
December 12, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION (AMENDED) | ||
December 12, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
December 12, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 20, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 16, 2023 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.