Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Andrews Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Kenneth Kelly, Lauren K Kelly, represented by Basedow, Stephen William, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of Sullivan County, New York. The plaintiff, Andrews Federal Credit Union, is suing the defendants, Lauren K. Kelly and Kenneth Kelly, for breach of contract. The plaintiff alleges that th...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: January 24, 2024ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 03, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: December 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 03, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE |
||
December 18, 2023 |
ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER |
||
December 05, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Of Compliance |
||
December 05, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
November 30, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 30, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D final statement |
||
November 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C payment history |
||
November 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Loan Final disclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.