Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Damon Mitchell, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Steiner, Norman M., against Sharon Ghelberg, represented by Schoenberg, Richard B, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Stephan G. Schick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York. The plaintiff, Damon Mitchell, is suing the defendant, Sharon Ghelberg, for negligence in a motor vehicle accident. The complaint alleges that on August 11, 2023,...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: November 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 12, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 20, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Please note the next virtual conference date of February 29, 2024, at 3 pm. |
||
November 22, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Please note that a virtual preliminary conference for this matter will be held on January 11, 2024, Please note that a virtual preliminary conference for this matter will be held on January 11, 2024, ... show more |
||
November 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Witness Information |
||
November 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Insurance Information |
||
November 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION | ||
November 20, 2023 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
November 20, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | ||
November 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Expert Witness Information |
||
November 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.