Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kalamata Capital Group, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bouskila, Ariel, against Cha Trucking, C.H.A. Truck N Transport, Cheechee Marshan Mcgowan, Columbus Haul All Ltd D B A Cha Truck-N- Transport, Shapes Babrer & Braid Shop Llc., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A MERCHANT AGREEMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 19, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 07, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: November 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AMENDED |
||
September 07, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint |
||
September 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Merchant Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Merchant Agreement Redacted |
||
September 07, 2022 | Affirmation of Default | ||
September 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION Affidavit of Second Mailing |
||
September 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service |
||
September 07, 2022 | Affirmation of Non Military |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.