Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nanas House Child Care Center, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hunter, Robert Bruce, against Amanda Blakesley, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 28, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: July 06, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 06, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.