Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Charles Sunnekalb, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against Kohl S Department Stores Inc, Kohls Department Stores Inc, Kohls New York Dc Inc, represented by Fenstermacher, Erica Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Mark M. Meddaugh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 17, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 09, 2017THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 06, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 06, 2019ANSWER
Date: April 24, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 20, 2017DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018STIPULATION - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: April 12, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 19, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 02, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 04, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 12, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 19, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 23, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 14, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 04, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 10, 2020ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 11, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 04, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 12, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 20, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 11, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 29, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 09, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 08, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 02, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 27, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Hearing |
Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
November 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
October 28, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 27, 2020 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 27, 2020 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon Mark M. Meddaugh |
||
October 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Held
Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
October 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
September 23, 2020 | Notice of Appeal - With Exhibits | ||
September 23, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision and Order with Notice of Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.