Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Accelerated Inventory Management, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Murtha, Timothy J, against George Gibson, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 26, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 26, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 17, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2021EXECUTION
Date: May 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021SUMMONS (PRE RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: March 17, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
June 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
May 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A LOAN SUMMARY/ LOAN AGREEMENT/ STATEMENTS |
||
May 26, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 26, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT MILITARY AFFIDAVIT |
||
May 26, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
May 26, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 14, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 14, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 17, 2021 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Verified Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.