Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Ronald H Gallagher, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 08, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 08, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 19, 2021ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: February 22, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 08, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
July 08, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
July 08, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE |
||
July 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
February 22, 2021 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION | ||
February 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.