Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
New City Funding Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stein, Mark H, against Jessica Patton, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with David Gandin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 05, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 05, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2022EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 05, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 05, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 14, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 18, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 20, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: June 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 10, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT military status |
||
June 10, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
May 20, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Additional Aff of Mailing |
||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Prior Papers |
||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons and Complaint |
||
April 18, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Atty Aff |
||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Aff of Service |
||
April 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Court's Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.