Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with McGuire, Hon. Michael F. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Hon. Michael F. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2018 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
April 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #003) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
April 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
April 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Mcguire (Court Activity) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
December 20, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #004) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #003) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
December 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #004) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
December 08, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #004) Decided: 04/19/2018Decided Before Justice: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. Answer demanded: No Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
November 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #003) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.