Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County, NY, . Sullivan County, NY Superior Courts with Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMeddaugh, Hon. Mark M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Cycle Time534 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Discontinued Meddaugh (Court Activity) Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
March 28, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Meddaugh (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
February 21, 2018 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Meddaugh (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
December 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Meddaugh (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
|
May 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Meddaugh (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Meddaugh, Hon. Mark M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.