Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County. This case was filed in Sullivan County Superior Courts with McGuire, Hon. Michael F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2017 |
CategoryTort-Other Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSullivan County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Case Cycle Time420 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Trial Set For Mcguire (Trial Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
March 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided Mcguire (Court Activity) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
March 16, 2018 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
November 27, 2017 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
November 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mcguire (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
November 08, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 03/16/2018Decided Before Justice: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. Answer demanded: No Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
November 08, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Mcguire (Motion Part) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
Note of Issue Filed Mcguire (Court Activity) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
October 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mcguire (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
|
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Mcguire (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: McGuire, Hon. Michael F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.