Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cesanyoly Bautista, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Kaplan, Cori, against Huntington Town Of, represented by Ramme, Roger D, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Assessment Judge, Small Claims presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2020 |
CategoryScar-Small Claims Assessment Review |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
SCAR PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
Date: October 09, 2020STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: July 21, 2021PETITION (AMENDED)
Date: June 30, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
July 30, 2021 | Hearing |
No Change in Assessment SCAR - Huntington Judge: Assessment Judge, Small Claims |
|
July 21, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
June 30, 2021 | PETITION (AMENDED) | ||
October 09, 2020 | SCAR PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.