Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Vehifax Corp., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kraslow, Richard A, against Jay Deline, represented by Crossmore, Edward Y, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Elizabeth Emerson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2014 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Cycle Time471 days |
STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: December 04, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 28, 2015JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2016DECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST
Date: March 02, 2016ANSWER
Date: August 05, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2016 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 23, 2016 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 23, 2016 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
March 07, 2016 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
March 02, 2016 | DECISION/ORDER AFTER INQUEST | ||
February 09, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G Richard A. Kraslow, P.C. Invoices |
||
February 09, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Nolan & Heller, LLP Invoices |
||
February 09, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Commercial Lease Agreement 5309 |
||
February 09, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Commercial Lease Agreement 5302 |
||
February 09, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Commercial Lease Agreement 5294 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.