Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fein, Such & Crane, Llp, Gindi, Michael Eddie, Spinelli, Victor, Tabakin, Gregg P, against Amy Olmeda Heir At Law Of Frank Olmeda, Clerk Of The Suffolk County District Court, Eric Olmeda Individually And As Heir At Law Of Frank Olmeda, Frank Olmeda Jr Heir At Law Of Frank Olmeda, Gabriel Rosado, (total of 17) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Joseph A Santorelli presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time1352 days |
-Of Frank Olmeda- The Unknown And Respective Heirs-At-Law Next-Of-Kin, Distributees, Exec., Admin., Trustees, Devisees, Legatees, Etc. All Having Or Claiming Under, By Or Through Frank Olmeda, Who May Be Deceased By Purchase, Inheritance, Lien Or Otherwise, Any Right, Title, Or Interest In The Real Property Desc
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2014JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 27, 2015RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: January 22, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 01, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 04, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 29, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 03, 2014EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 22, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: October 19, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 27, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 21, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 22, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 14, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 21, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 21, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Fiduciary Clerk Office Post Judgment; NO SURPLUS 3/27/18, S&U/127,500 (Conversion) Judge: Santorelli, Hon. Joseph A. |
|
October 05, 2018 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE/FORM RECEIVED FIDUCIARY CLERK OFFICE NO SURPLUS 3/27/18 S&U/127,500 Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
|
June 13, 2018 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
March 27, 2018 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Sale Date Judge: Santorelli, Hon. Joseph A. |
|
March 05, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE SALE DATE Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
|
December 21, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 19, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #005) Motion Part 10 EFILED, EFILED (Conversion) Judge: Santorelli, Hon. Joseph A. |
|
September 21, 2017 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #005) MOTION PART 10 EFILED EFILED Judge: JOSEPH A. SANTORELLI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.