Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gerasimos Berdebes, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Popat, Seni, against Catherine Snyder, Frederick C. Snyder, represented by Moroney, John Peter, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiff, Gerasimos Berdebes, is suing the defendants, Catherine Snyder and Frederick C. Snyder. The complaint alleges that on June 23, 20...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306-c letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 27, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Declaration Sheets Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 16, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | ANSWER & COMBINED DEMANDS | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Declaration Sheets Redacted per 22 NYCRR Declaration Sheets Redacted |
||
December 19, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Def C Snyder |
||
December 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Def F Snyder |
||
November 27, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 306-c letter Redacted per 22 NYCRR 306-c letter Redacted |
||
November 21, 2023 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.