Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Joselyn Noriega, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Linder, Mark, against Gelyn A. Linares, Juan C. Viteri-Calle, L. V. Urrutia Sanchez, represented by Korcz, Amy Beth, Schondebare, James Arthur, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiff, Joselyn Noriega, is filing a complaint against the defendants, Juan C. Viteri-Calle, L. V. Urrutia Sanchez, and Gelyn A. Linares...
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 22, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 23, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 06, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 23, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 16, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 23, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 11, 2024 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER W/CROSS CLAIMS, DEMANDS AND AFF OF SERVICE |
||
December 22, 2023 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
December 22, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 16, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 16, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.