Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Eileen Elmendorf As Administratrix Of The Estate Of, Eileen Elmendorf Individually,, James Elmendorf Deceased, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Belluck, Joseph Warren, Dymond, Seth A, against American Honda Motor Co., Inc., Atk, As Successor To Thiokol, Atk, Individually, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Dana Companies, Llc, F K A Dana Corporation, As Successor To Cutler-Hammer Inc., (total of 50) See All represented by Chappell, Robert Jason, Cook, Kerryann Marie, Corbin, Steven Thomas, Damico, Gregory, Decicco, Daniel Edwin, (total of 27) See All in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Jerry Garguilo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Asbestos |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
This complaint was filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Suffolk. The plaintiff, Eileen Elmendorf, is suing multiple defendants, including American Honda Motor Co., Inc., ATK, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Dana Compan...
ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 28, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 06, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 27, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 27, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 18, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 22, 2024ANSWER
Date: December 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: January 17, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 15, 2023ANSWER
Date: January 18, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 26, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 31, 2024ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 07, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: January 22, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 18, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 25, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 27, 2023ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM
Date: January 29, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 19, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: December 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 15, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 23, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 17, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 16, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A PLAINTIFFS INITIAL FACT SHEET Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 23, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 21, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 21, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: November 21, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: November 21, 2023ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry for MBUSA Partial Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 29, 2024 |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM 1/29/24 MOT #001 AS TO MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC |
||
January 25, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) Proposed Order Granting MBUSA Partial Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 22, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 22, 2024 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
January 19, 2024 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PC Stipulation and Order |
||
January 18, 2024 |
ANSWER ISZA |
||
January 18, 2024 |
ANSWER TMS |
||
January 17, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 09, 2024 | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.