Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bayberry Beach & Tennis Club Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Cronin, Brad W, against The Board Of Assessors And The Assessors And The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Islip And The Town Of Islip, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with John J Leo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time177 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 06, 2020PETITION
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER AND JUDGMENT |
|
June 25, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE PART 13 Judge: JOHN J. LEO (TAX) |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) 024-1235 ORDER & JUDGMENT |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 024-1235 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT & OTHER RELATED DOCUMENTS |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER 024-1235 RJI 201920, TAX SETTLEMENT |
|
January 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT 024-1235 RJI AFFIDAVIT 201920 |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
PETITION 024-1235 2019/20 PETITION - SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.