Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Zenon Opechowski, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Siben, Andrew B., against Francis J. Accardi Jr., represented by Youllar, Thomas J, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Suffolk County Supreme Court with _ Dcm Justice presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management220 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuffolk County Supreme Court |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: August 18, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 26, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Hearing |
ADR1-CC 12:00 PM Judge: ALT DISPUTE RESOLUTION JUSTICE |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | |
August 07, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD PRELIMINARY CONF PART DCM Judge: DCM-JUSTICE |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response To Notice Of Insurance Disclosure (Originally Mailed 4/14/20) |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer with Omnibus Discovery Demands | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS Medicaid-HMS Notification |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Francis J. Accardi, Jr. |
|
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.