Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Howard H. Heckman, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2018 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time1174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #003) MOTION PART 18 Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
October 25, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) MOTION PART 18 NO PAPERS Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
September 20, 2018 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #003) Decided: 11/13/2018MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: HOWARD HECKMAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
February 27, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) MOTION PART 18 EFILED Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
January 31, 2018 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (Motion #002) Decided: 03/05/2018CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: HOWARD HECKMAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
September 12, 2017 | Hearing |
CONF HELD CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 18 9:30 A.M. NEEDS PAPERS Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
September 05, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 18 9:30 A.M. NEEDS PAPERS Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
August 17, 2017 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD CONFERENCE CALENDAR PART 18 9:30 A.M. PER 8/7/17 ORDER Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
February 27, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTION PART 18 Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
|
December 17, 2014 | Motion |
APPT REFEREE (Motion #001) Decided: 09/19/2017MOTION GRANTED Before Justice: HOWARD HECKMAN Answer demanded: No Judge: HOWARD HECKMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.