Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
2500 Grand Avenue Corp., Cbs Development, Llc, Circle K Ranch Corp., Executive Boulevard Llc, Global Health Laboratories, Llc, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Demaro, John Arthur, Mulholland, Mark Steven, against Islero Group, Llc, James Gibbons, Minotaur Management Group, Llc, represented by Cordano, Richard Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts Supreme with J-Comm Hudson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJ-Comm Hudson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 08, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 23, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 05, 2022ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 16, 2022ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: June 03, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 03, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 03, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: April 29, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 14, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: July 20, 2023DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: April 11, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: October 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
July 20, 2023 |
ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST Letter re Teams Conference |
||
December 08, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 23, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 05, 2022 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Plaintiffs' Verified Reply to Counterclaims |
||
June 16, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
June 03, 2022 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
June 03, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
||
June 03, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.