Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Joseph A. Ortiz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Andruzzi, Joseph C, against Jamie E. Mulligan, represented by Borrelli, Gary F, in the jurisdiction of Suffolk County. This case was filed in Suffolk County Superior Courts with Adr Alternate Dispute Resolution presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdr Alternate Dispute Resolution Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSuffolk County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 29, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 23, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 03, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2023---12.19---MedicalDisclos(Misc.)(PipLog)
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 05, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 13, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 07, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 06, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Plaintiff's Demands and ADR Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 27, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2023---10.16---MedicalDisclos(Records)(SteinDC)
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 11, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 11, 2023THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: October 10, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 08, 2023ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: October 05, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 05, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 03, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 13, 2023OATH
Date: September 11, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 01, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 01, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2023---09.01---MedicalDisclos(AZs)
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 22, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 2024---01.29----NoticeIntention(3122aNotice.4518(a)(c)(Notice)(SpectrumPT&Chiro) |
||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #001) EX.4.(Def.ResponsetoPlaintiffDemandsandADROrder(NYSCEFDoc#34)(11.24.2023)) |
||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) EX.3.(Plaintiff.PhotoDisclos(NYSCEFDoc#17)(9.13.2023)) |
||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) EX.1.(SummonsandVerifiedComplaint)(NYSCEFDoc#1)(08.10.2023) |
||
January 23, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) 2024---01.23---Aff |
||
January 23, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) 2024---01.23---Not.MotSJ |
||
January 23, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) EX.2.(Answer)(NYSCEFDoc#4)(08.31.2023) |
||
January 23, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS (Motion #001) 2024---01.23---StatementofMaterialFact |
||
January 23, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) 2024---01.23---AFD.Supp(ortiz) |
||
January 03, 2024 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.